MN HF748 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-10)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Authors added Xiong, J. and Daniels
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Authors added Xiong, J. and Daniels
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Parental contribution fees for services for children with disabilities eliminated.
Title
Parental contribution fees for services for children with disabilities eliminated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Authors added Xiong, J. and Daniels |
2019-03-21 | House | Author added Kunesh-Podein |
2019-03-18 | House | Author added Carlson, L. |
2019-03-15 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-03-14 | House | Author added Pierson |
2019-03-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-03-07 | House | Author added Her |
2019-03-04 | House | Authors added Noor and Lee |
2019-02-21 | House | Authors added Moran and Richardson |
2019-02-14 | House | Authors added Lucero and Pryor |
2019-02-11 | House | Authors added Schultz, Olson, and Hornstein |
2019-02-07 | House | Authors added Freiberg and Baker |
2019-02-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF480 (Similar To) 2019-02-18 - Author added Bigham