MN HF754 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - Author added Edelson
Pending: House Corrections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - Author added Edelson
Pending: House Corrections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mama's Bus pilot project established to provide parent and child bonding and literacy for incarcerated women and their children, and money appropriated.
Title
Mama's Bus pilot project established to provide parent and child bonding and literacy for incarcerated women and their children, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Author added Edelson |
2019-02-28 | House | Author added Poston |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred by Chair to Corrections Division |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |
2019-02-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF471 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy