MN HF766 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Author added Brand
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Author added Brand
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Medical cannabis and industrial hemp requirements modified, and money appropriated.
Title
Medical cannabis and industrial hemp requirements modified, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | Author added Brand |
2019-04-03 | House | Author added Loeffler |
2019-04-01 | House | Author added Bierman |
2019-03-15 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-03-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-03-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Commerce |
2019-02-18 | House | Author added Cantrell |
2019-02-14 | House | Author added Huot |
2019-02-11 | House | Author added Dehn |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1070 (Similar To) 2019-03-25 - Comm report: Amended, No recommendation, re-referred to E-12 Finance and Policy