MN HF811 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Author added Bahner
Pending: House Agriculture and Food Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Author added Bahner
Pending: House Agriculture and Food Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Farm-to-school program established, and money appropriated.
Title
Farm-to-school program established, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | Author added Bahner |
2019-03-18 | House | Authors added Dettmer, Acomb, Hassan, and Kunesh-Podein |
2019-02-21 | House | Author added Sundin |
2019-02-14 | House | Author added Jurgens |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred by Chair to Agriculture and Food Finance and Policy Division |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1346 (Similar To) 2019-03-04 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Finance