MN HF814 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - Author added Loeffler
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - Author added Loeffler
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
School-linked mental health grants modified, report required, and money appropriated.
Title
School-linked mental health grants modified, report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | Author added Loeffler |
2019-03-07 | House | Author added Bahner |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-02-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-02-27 | House | Author added Lee |
2019-02-11 | House | Authors added Xiong, T., Brand, Moller, and Dehn |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF969 (Similar To) 2019-02-07 - Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy