MN HF850 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Wildlife disease management for chronic wasting disease funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Wildlife disease management for chronic wasting disease funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | House | Second reading |
2019-05-17 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2019-03-28 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means |
2019-03-18 | House | Author added Persell |
2019-02-27 | House | Author added Kunesh-Podein |
2019-02-25 | House | Authors added Richardson and Tabke |
2019-02-21 | House | Authors added Nelson and Olson |
2019-02-11 | House | Authors added Lillie and Brand |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1729 (Similar To) 2019-03-13 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance