MN HF87 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Author added Runbeck
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Author added Runbeck
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal sexual conduct cases stays of adjudication established as departures from the sentencing guidelines, persons subject to stays of adjudication in criminal sexual conduct cases required to register as predatory offenders, and criminal history points required to be assessed against offenders who violate cases for the stayed offense.
Title
Criminal sexual conduct cases stays of adjudication established as departures from the sentencing guidelines, persons subject to stays of adjudication in criminal sexual conduct cases required to register as predatory offenders, and criminal history points required to be assessed against offenders who violate cases for the stayed offense.
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Grossell [R] | Rep. Jim Nash [R] | Rep. John Poston [R] | Sen. Steve Green [R] |
Rep. Tama Theis [R] | Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] | Rep. Linda Runbeck [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | House | Author added Runbeck |
2019-01-22 | House | Authors added Theis and Dettmer |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF839 (Similar To) 2020-02-11 - Chief author added Utke