MN HF878 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-6)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Building and construction contract retainage requirements modified.
Title
Building and construction contract retainage requirements modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Mahoney [D] | Sen. Cal Bahr [R] | Sen. Jason Rarick [R] | Rep. Jim Nash [R] |
Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] | Rep. Marion O'Neill [R] | Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] | Rep. John Huot [D] |
Rep. Steve Elkins [D] | Rep. Mike Sundin [D] | Rep. Mike Nelson [D] | Rep. John Persell [D] |
Rep. Laurie Halverson [D] | Rep. Ron Kresha [R] | Rep. Raymond Dehn [D] | Rep. Robert Bierman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means |
2019-03-11 | House | Author added Bierman |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred by Chair to Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division |
2019-03-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-02-11 | House | Author added Dehn |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Labor |
Same As/Similar To
SF947 (Similar To) 2019-03-26 - Second reading