MN HF892 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Secretary of State Chapter 44
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Secretary of State Chapter 44
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Pharmacy licensure requirements modified.
Title
Pharmacy licensure requirements modified.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House: Passage (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House: Passage (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | Secretary of State Chapter 44 | |
2019-05-22 | Governor's action Approval | |
2019-05-22 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2019-05-22 | Governor approval | |
2019-05-22 | Presented to Governor | |
2019-05-18 | House | Returned from Senate |
2019-05-18 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2019-05-18 | Senate | Special Order |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF1351 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF1351, now on General Orders |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-03-21 | House | Bill was passed |
2019-03-21 | House | Third reading |
2019-03-20 | House | Author added Munson |
2019-03-20 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Second reading |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2019-03-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Policy |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce |
Same As/Similar To
SF1351 (Similar To) 2019-03-26 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF892