MN HF901 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Domestic abuse no contact order violations added to the list of conduct that can be admitted into evidence.
Title
Domestic abuse no contact order violations added to the list of conduct that can be admitted into evidence.
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Pinto [D] | Rep. Marion O'Neill [R] | Rep. Jamie Becker-finn [D] | Rep. Zack Stephenson [D] |
Rep. Kelly Moller [D] | Rep. Ami Wazlawik [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |
2019-02-11 | House | Author added Wazlawik |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF1149 (Similar To) 2019-03-04 - Second reading