MN HF921 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Author stricken Gruenhagen
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Author stricken Gruenhagen
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Commissioner of human services required to contract with dental administrators to administer dental services to medical assistance and MinnesotaCare recipients.
Title
Commissioner of human services required to contract with dental administrators to administer dental services to medical assistance and MinnesotaCare recipients.
Sponsors
Rep. Tina Liebling [D] | Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] | Rep. Hunter Cantrell [D] | Rep. Peter Fischer [D] |
Rep. Rod Hamilton [R] | Rep. Raymond Dehn [D] | Rep. Robert Bierman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | House | Author stricken Gruenhagen |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-03-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-02-18 | House | Author added Bierman |
2019-02-14 | House | Author added Dehn |
2019-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1151 (Similar To) 2019-02-14 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy