MN HF929 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Author added Pryor
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Author added Pryor
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Commissioner of human services directed to seek brain injury waiver amendment, and traumatic brain injury definition for the state traumatic brain injury program modified.
Title
Commissioner of human services directed to seek brain injury waiver amendment, and traumatic brain injury definition for the state traumatic brain injury program modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | House | Author added Pryor |
2019-03-27 | House | Author added Gomez |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-02-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-02-18 | House | Author added Moller |
2019-02-14 | House | Author added Huot |
2019-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1429 (Similar To) 2019-02-18 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy