MN HF930 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-9)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Author added Gomez
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Author added Gomez
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Commissioner of human services directed to develop medical assistance TEFRA enrollment content, medical assistance TEFRA stakeholder group option established, and report required.
Title
Commissioner of human services directed to develop medical assistance TEFRA enrollment content, medical assistance TEFRA stakeholder group option established, and report required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | House | Author added Gomez |
2019-03-27 | House | Authors added Schomacker and Sandstede |
2019-03-18 | House | Author added Carlson, L. |
2019-03-15 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-03-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-03-07 | House | Author added Her |
2019-03-04 | House | Author added Noor |
2019-02-21 | House | Author added Lucero |
2019-02-18 | House | Author added Hansen |
2019-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF494 (Similar To) 2019-02-04 - Author added Kiffmeyer