MN HF939 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Author added Cantrell
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Author added Cantrell
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Civil right to vote restored to individual upon release from incarceration or upon sentencing if incarceration is not imposed, notice required, and county attorney obligation to promptly investigate voter registration and eligibility repealed.
Title
Civil right to vote restored to individual upon release from incarceration or upon sentencing if incarceration is not imposed, notice required, and county attorney obligation to promptly investigate voter registration and eligibility repealed.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | House | Author added Cantrell |
2019-02-14 | House | Author added Huot |
2019-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF1191 (Similar To) 2019-03-26 - Author added Cohen