MN HF949 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-13 - Author added Backer
Pending: House Property and Local Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-13 - Author added Backer
Pending: House Property and Local Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Lilydale; local government aid onetime adjustment provided.
Title
Lilydale; local government aid onetime adjustment provided.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Hansen [D] | Rep. Jeff Backer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | House | Author added Backer |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred by Chair to Property and Local Tax Division |
2019-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF1176 (Similar To) 2019-02-14 - Referred to Taxes