MN HF980 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Author added Long
Pending: House Subcommittee on Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Author added Long
Pending: House Subcommittee on Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Individuals under the age of 18 authorized to vote at a primary election in certain circumstances.
Title
Individuals under the age of 18 authorized to vote at a primary election in certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Rep. Aisha Gomez [D] | Rep. Raymond Dehn [D] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Jay Xiong [D] |
Rep. Connie Bernardy [D] | Rep. Jamie Long [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | Author added Long |
2019-03-07 | House | Author added Bernardy |
2019-02-14 | House | Author added Xiong, J. |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred by Chair to Subcommittee on Elections |
2019-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |