MN HF994 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Author added Pierson
Pending: House Jobs and Economic Development Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Author added Pierson
Pending: House Jobs and Economic Development Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Venture SE Minnesota Diversification revolving loan program created, and money appropriated.
Title
Venture SE Minnesota Diversification revolving loan program created, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Gregory Davids [R] | Rep. Peggy Bennett [R] | Rep. Barb Haley [R] | Rep. John Petersburg [R] |
Rep. Duane Sauke [D] | Rep. Nels Pierson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | Author added Pierson |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred by Chair to Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division |
2019-03-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-02-28 | House | Author added Sauke |
2019-02-27 | House | Authors added Haley and Petersburg |
2019-02-14 | House | Author added Bennett |
2019-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce |
Same As/Similar To
SF1825 (Similar To) 2019-02-27 - Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy