MN SF10 | 2019 | 91st Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus state government appropriations
Title
Omnibus state government appropriations
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Kiffmeyer [R] | Sen. Mark Koran [R] | Sen. Bruce Anderson [R] | Sen. Andrew Mathews [R] |
Sen. James Carlson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-25 - House - House: Passage (Y: 77 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-25 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 53 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-25 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 51 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-25 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 46 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-25 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 52 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-25 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 53 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-25 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 51 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-25 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 46 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-25 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 52 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2019-05-30 | Governor approval | |
2019-05-30 | Secretary of State Chapter 10 | |
2019-05-30 | Governor's action Approval | |
2019-05-28 | Presented to Governor | |
2019-05-24 | House | Bill was passed |
2019-05-24 | House | Third reading |
2019-05-24 | House | Amendments offered |
2019-05-24 | House | Second reading |
2019-05-24 | House | Rules suspended, urgency declared |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate file first reading |
2019-05-24 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Returned from House |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Bill passed |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Taken from table |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Laid on table |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Third reading |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Urgency declared rules suspended |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF8 (Similar To) 2019-05-24 - Introduction and first reading