MN SF1003 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Richard J. Ames memorial highway designation
Title
Richard J. Ames memorial highway designation
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Pratt [R] | Sen. Dan Hall [R] | Sen. Rich Draheim [R] | Sen. Mike Goggin [R] |
Sen. Matt Little [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-19 - House - House: Passage (Y: 129 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2019-05-22 | Governor approval | |
2019-05-22 | Secretary of State Chapter 55 | |
2019-05-22 | Governor's action Approval | |
2019-05-22 | Presented to Governor | |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Returned from House |
2019-05-19 | House | Bill was passed |
2019-05-19 | House | Third reading |
2019-05-17 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Sunday, May 19, 2019 |
2019-05-15 | House | Second reading |
2019-05-15 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2019-05-14 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF836 |
2019-05-14 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Authors added Hall; Draheim; Goggin; Little |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF836 (Similar To) 2019-05-15 - HF indefinitely postponed