MN SF111 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-19 - Third reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-19 - Third reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Sexual conduct crimes provisions modification
Title
Sexual conduct crimes provisions modification
Sponsors
Sen. Warren Limmer [R] | Sen. Sandra Pappas [D] | Sen. Jerry Relph [R] | Sen. Michelle Benson [R] |
Sen. John Marty [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-19 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Special Order |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF341 (Similar To) 2019-05-14 - Second reading