MN SF19 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Author added Wiger
Pending: Senate E-12 Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Author added Wiger
Pending: Senate E-12 Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Personal finance course for high school graduation requirement
Title
Personal finance course for high school graduation requirement
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Cwodzinski [D] | Sen. John Marty [D] | Sen. Ann Rest [D] | Sen. Jason Isaacson [D] |
Sen. Charles Wiger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Senate | Author added Wiger |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Author added Isaacson |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Authors added Marty; Rest |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Referred to E-12 Finance and Policy |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF847 (Similar To) 2019-03-11 - Author added Xiong, J.