MN SF2130 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus liquor bill
Title
Omnibus liquor bill
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Dahms [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 62 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-16 - House - House: CALENDAR FOR THE DAY (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 57 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-16 - House - House: CALENDAR FOR THE DAY (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 57 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-27 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2020-05-27 | Governor approval | |
2020-05-27 | Secretary of State Chapter 103 | |
2020-05-27 | Governor's action Approval | |
2020-05-18 | Presented to Governor | |
2020-05-17 | Senate | Third reading |
2020-05-17 | Senate | Senate concurred and repassed bill |
2020-05-17 | Senate | Returned from House with amendment |
2020-05-16 | House | Bill was passed |
2020-05-16 | House | Third reading |
2020-05-16 | House | Amendments offered |
2020-05-14 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Saturday, May 16, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | House | Second reading |
2020-05-07 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2020-05-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2020-05-05 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2020-05-05 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2019-05-15 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-06 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, May 07, 2019 |
2019-04-08 | House | Second reading |
2019-04-08 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2019-04-05 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF2290 |
2019-04-05 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2290 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Author added Halverson as chief author