MN SF2188 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Senate file first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Senate file first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus department of corrections policy bill
Title
Omnibus department of corrections policy bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | House | Senate file first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |
2019-05-07 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Author added Bigham |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |