MN SF2346 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Author added Franzen
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Author added Franzen
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Pediatric autoimmune disorders associated with streptococcal infections (PANDAS) and pediatric acute-onset neuropsychiatric syndrome (PANS) treatment health plan coverage requirement
Title
Pediatric autoimmune disorders associated with streptococcal infections (PANDAS) and pediatric acute-onset neuropsychiatric syndrome (PANS) treatment health plan coverage requirement
Sponsors
Sen. Melissa Wiklund [D] | Sen. Michelle Benson [R] | Sen. Ronald Latz [D] | Sen. Steve Cwodzinski [D] |
Sen. Melisa Franzen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | Senate | Author added Franzen |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Authors added Latz; Cwodzinski |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF306 (Similar To) 2019-04-01 - Author added Dettmer