MN SF2452 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF2414
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF2414
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus health and human services appropriations
Title
Omnibus health and human services appropriations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF2414 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2414 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Senate conferees Benson, Abeler, Utke, Jensen and Marty