MN SF2693 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Authors added Dziedzic; Limmer; Utke; Eichorn
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Authors added Dziedzic; Limmer; Utke; Eichorn
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Landlord requirement for tenant proof of need for service or support animal authorization
Title
Landlord requirement for tenant proof of need for service or support animal authorization
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Hall [R] | Sen. Kari Dziedzic [D] | Sen. Warren Limmer [R] | Sen. Paul Utke [R] |
Sen. Justin Eichorn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Authors added Dziedzic; Limmer; Utke; Eichorn |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Second reading |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3606 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Housing Finance and Policy Division