MN SF2902 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Human Services Reform Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Human Services Reform Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Civil commitment provisions modifications; engagement services pilot project establishment
Title
Civil commitment provisions modifications; engagement services pilot project establishment
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Relph [R] | Sen. Matt Klein [D] | Sen. Paul Utke [R] | Sen. Ronald Latz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Author added Latz |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2898 (Similar To) 2020-03-16 - Second reading