MN SF2919 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-28 - Senate file first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy
Pending: House Health and Human Services Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-28 - Senate file first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy
Pending: House Health and Human Services Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Minnesota Athletic Trainers Act modification
Title
Minnesota Athletic Trainers Act modification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-28 | House | Senate file first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
2020-04-28 | House | Received from Senate |
2020-04-27 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2020-04-27 | Senate | Special Order |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second reading |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Author added Frentz |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Author added Abeler |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Author added Rosen |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2920 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Author added Franson