MN SF3062 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Loan forgiveness programs clarifying and technical changes; ongoing appropriation; higher education labor agreements ratification
Title
Loan forgiveness programs clarifying and technical changes; ongoing appropriation; higher education labor agreements ratification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-20 - House - House: Passage (Y: 127 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2018-05-29 | Governor approval | |
2018-05-29 | Secretary of State Chapter 207 | |
2018-05-29 | Governor's action Approval | |
2018-05-21 | Presented to Governor | |
2018-05-20 | Senate | Returned from House |
2018-05-20 | House | Bill was passed vote: 127-4 |
2018-05-20 | House | Third reading |
2018-05-18 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Sunday, May 20, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | House | Second reading |
2018-05-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-05-16 | House | Motion prevailed |
2018-05-16 | House | Motion to recall pursuant to House rule 4.30 |
2018-05-15 | House | Senate file first reading, referred to Higher Education and Career Readiness Policy and Finance |
2018-05-15 | House | Received from Senate |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 55-0 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education Finance and Policy |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3051 (Similar To) 2018-02-26 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Higher Education and Career Readiness Policy and Finance