MN SF3133 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Secretary of State Chapter 101 03/22/18
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Secretary of State Chapter 101 03/22/18
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Minnesota licensing and registration system (MNLARS) development and implementation requirements, report requirement and appropriation
Title
Minnesota licensing and registration system (MNLARS) development and implementation requirements, report requirement and appropriation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - House - House: Repassage, as amended by Conference (Y: 124 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 48 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 98 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 45 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-19 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 8 N: 117 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-19 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 81 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House: Torkelson motion - Suspension of Rules (Y: 126 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Motion did not prevail for Urgency, Rules Suspension, Third Reading and Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 48 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 98 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 45 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-19 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 8 N: 117 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-19 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 81 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House: Torkelson motion - Suspension of Rules (Y: 126 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Motion did not prevail for Urgency, Rules Suspension, Third Reading and Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Secretary of State Chapter 101 03/22/18 | |
2018-03-26 | Governor's action Approval 03/22/18 | |
2018-03-26 | Senate | House adopted SCC report and repassed bill |
2018-03-22 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2018-03-22 | Governor approval | |
2018-03-22 | Presented to Governor | |
2018-03-22 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 124-6 |
2018-03-22 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2018-03-22 | House | House adopted conference committee report |
2018-03-22 | House | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2018-03-22 | House | Joint rule 2.06 - twelve hour rule suspended |
2018-03-22 | House | Motion to suspend rules |
2018-03-22 | House | Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed vote: 48-17 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Third reading vote: 48-17 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2018-03-22 | Senate | House conferees Torkelson; Baker; Nelson |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate conferees Newman; Osmek; Dibble |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate not concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Returned from House with amendment |
2018-03-21 | House | House conferees Torkelson, Baker, and Nelson. |
2018-03-21 | House | House accedes, conference committee of 3 to be appointed |
2018-03-21 | House | Senate conferees Newman, Osmek, and Dibble. |
2018-03-21 | House | Senate refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2018-03-19 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 98-27 |
2018-03-19 | House | Third reading as amended |
2018-03-19 | House | Amended |
2018-03-19 | House | Second reading |
2018-03-19 | House | Rules suspended, urgency declared vote: 126-0 |
2018-03-19 | House | Senate file first reading |
2018-03-19 | House | Received from Senate |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 47-20 |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Motion did not prevail for Urgency, Rules Suspension, Third Reading and Final Passage |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3724 (Similar To) 2018-03-12 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Finance