MN SF326 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 29 05/17/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 29 05/17/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Body art technicians supervisors requirements modification
Title
Body art technicians supervisors requirements modification
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Koran [R] | Sen. John Hoffman [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | Secretary of State Chapter 29 05/17/2019 | |
2019-05-20 | Governor's action Approval 05/17/2019 | |
2019-05-17 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2019-05-17 | Governor approval | |
2019-05-17 | Presented to Governor | |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Third reading |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Senate concurred and repassed bill |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Taken from table |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Laid on table |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Returned from House with amendment |
2019-05-13 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2019-05-13 | House | Third reading as amended |
2019-05-13 | House | Amended |
2019-05-09 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, May 13, 2019 |
2019-05-01 | House | Second reading |
2019-05-01 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2019-04-30 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF783 |
2019-04-30 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Special Order |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF783 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - HF indefinitely postponed