MN SF3358 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Minimum age for safe amusement ride operation establishment; lawn care equipment operation by 16 and 17 year olds authorization
Title
Minimum age for safe amusement ride operation establishment; lawn care equipment operation by 16 and 17 year olds authorization
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - House - House: CALENDAR FOR THE DAY (Y: 126 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - House - House: CALENDAR FOR THE DAY (Y: 126 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-27 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2020-05-27 | Governor approval | |
2020-05-27 | Secretary of State Chapter 98 | |
2020-05-27 | Governor's action Approval | |
2020-05-18 | Presented to Governor | |
2020-05-16 | Senate | Third reading |
2020-05-16 | Senate | Senate concurred and repassed bill |
2020-05-16 | Senate | Taken from table |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Laid on table |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Returned from House with amendment |
2020-05-14 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2020-05-14 | House | Third reading as amended |
2020-05-14 | House | Amended |
2020-05-12 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 14, 2020 |
2020-05-11 | House | Second reading |
2020-05-11 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2020-05-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2020-05-04 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2020-05-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2020-04-28 | House | Senate file first reading, referred to Labor |
2020-04-28 | House | Received from Senate |
2020-04-20 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2020-04-20 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Second reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3720 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Authors added Poston and Lueck