MN SF357 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Transportation Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Transportation Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Autism spectrum disorder and mental health conditions diagnosis driver's license or identification card disability designation authorization
Title
Autism spectrum disorder and mental health conditions diagnosis driver's license or identification card disability designation authorization
Sponsors
Sen. Rich Draheim [R] | Sen. Karla Bigham [D] | Sen. Bernhard Eken [D] | Sen. David Senjem [R] |
Sen. Paul T. Anderson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Transportation Finance and Policy |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF302 (Similar To) 2019-03-18 - Referred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division