MN SF3745 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Polk county law library money transfer to county for technological improvements to county courthouse authorization
Title
Polk county law library money transfer to county for technological improvements to county courthouse authorization
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-17 - House - House: CALENDAR FOR THE DAY (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 61 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 61 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-27 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2020-05-27 | Governor approval | |
2020-05-27 | Secretary of State Chapter 117 | |
2020-05-27 | Governor's action Approval | |
2020-05-18 | Presented to Governor | |
2020-05-17 | Senate | Third reading |
2020-05-17 | Senate | Senate concurred and repassed bill |
2020-05-17 | Senate | Returned from House with amendment |
2020-05-17 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2020-05-17 | House | Third reading as amended |
2020-05-17 | House | Amended |
2020-05-15 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Sunday, May 17, 2020 |
2020-05-15 | House | Second reading |
2020-05-15 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2020-05-14 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF3804 |
2020-05-14 | House | Received from Senate |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Special Order |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Second reading |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Withdrawn |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3804 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - HF indefinitely postponed