MN SF4 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration
Pending: Senate Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration
Pending: Senate Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Human services provider enrollment medical assistance (MA) modification; counted income clarification; surety bond requirements; programs documentation, and commissioner of human services authority modifications; visit verification system; universal identification number; fraud prevention investigations appropriation
Title
Human services provider enrollment medical assistance (MA) modification; counted income clarification; surety bond requirements; programs documentation, and commissioner of human services authority modifications; visit verification system; universal identification number; fraud prevention investigations appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | Senate | Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Author added Nelson |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Author added Hoffman |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Family Care and Aging |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Chief author added Relph |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Chief author stricken, shown as co-author Abeler |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Family Care and Aging |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |