MN SF512 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-16 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-16 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
COVID-19 gambling control laws temporary adjustment; gambling control board annual reports filing requirement
Title
COVID-19 gambling control laws temporary adjustment; gambling control board annual reports filing requirement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-16 | House | Second reading |
2020-05-16 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2020-05-15 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF356 |
2020-05-15 | House | Received from Senate |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Second reading |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Comm report: Adopt previous comm report Jt. rule 2.03 suspended |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Author added Hoffman |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Author added Tomassoni |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF356 (Similar To) 2020-05-16 - HF indefinitely postponed