MN SF753 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-09 - Senate file first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-09 - Senate file first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus DWI bill
Title
Omnibus DWI bill
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Johnson [R] | Sen. Warren Limmer [R] | Sen. Ronald Latz [D] | Sen. Mark Koran [R] |
Sen. Greg Clausen [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Senate file first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |
2019-05-09 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Author added Clausen |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Author added Koran |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Author added Latz |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1263 (Similar To) 2019-02-14 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division