MN SF92 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-06 - Chief author added Relph
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-06 - Chief author added Relph
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus human services reform bill
Title
Omnibus human services reform bill
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Relph [R] | Sen. Jim Abeler [R] | Sen. John Hoffman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-06 | Senate | Chief author added Relph |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Chief author stricken, shown as co-author Abeler |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Rule 12.10: report of votes in committee |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF168 (Similar To) 2020-05-05 - Author added Masin