MN SF955 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 28 05/17/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 28 05/17/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Health licensing technical changes; mental health professionals duty to warn and reciprocity expansion
Title
Health licensing technical changes; mental health professionals duty to warn and reciprocity expansion
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - House - House: Passage (Y: 126 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | Secretary of State Chapter 28 05/17/2019 | |
2019-05-20 | Governor's action Approval 05/17/2019 | |
2019-05-17 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2019-05-17 | Governor approval | |
2019-05-17 | Presented to Governor | |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Returned from House |
2019-05-14 | House | Bill was passed |
2019-05-14 | House | Third reading |
2019-05-10 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-10 | House | Second reading |
2019-05-10 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2019-05-09 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF2206 |
2019-05-09 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Special Order |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2019-02-21 | Senate | General Orders: Stricken and re-referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2206 (Similar To) 2019-05-10 - HF indefinitely postponed