MO HB10 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 9 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-11 - No Motion Made - to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 9 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-11 - No Motion Made - to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates money for the expenses, grants, refunds, and distributions of the Department of Mental Health, Board of Public Buildings, and Department of Health and Senior Services
Title
Appropriates money for the expenses, grants, refunds, and distributions of the Department of Mental Health, Board of Public Buildings, and Department of Health and Senior Services
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Stream [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-11 | House | No Motion Made - to override Governor's veto |
2013-06-28 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2013-06-28 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2013-06-28 | House | Vetoed in Part by Governor (G) |
2013-05-22 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2013-05-22 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2013-05-22 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2013-05-09 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 31 NOES: 2 |
2013-05-09 | House | Senate Adopts Conference Committee Report (S) - AYES: 32 NOES: 1 |
2013-05-09 | House | Senate Submits Conference Committee Report (S) |
2013-05-09 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 106 NOES: 51 |
2013-05-09 | House | House Adopts Conference Committee Report (H) - AYES: 105 NOES: 49 |
2013-05-08 | House | House Submits Conference Committee Report (H) |
2013-04-30 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES STREAM, ALLEN, KIRKTON |
2013-04-30 | House | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - SENATORS SCHAEFER, RUPP, KEHOE, CURLS, AND WALSH |
2013-04-30 | House | Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S) |
2013-04-29 | House | House Refuses to Concur, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 28 NOES: 3 |
2013-04-22 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2013-04-19 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 18, 2013, 8:30 a.m., SCR 2 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 17, 2013, Upon Evening Adjournment, SCR 2 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled (S) - Tuesday, April 16, 2013 Evening Hearing Cancelled |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 16, 2013, Upon Evening Adjournment, SCR 2 |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled (S) - MONDAY, APRIL15, 2013, UPON AFTERNOON ADJOURNMENT |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 15, 2013, Upon Evening Adjournment, SCR 2 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - FRIDAY, APRIL 12, 2013, 9:00AM, SCR 2 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - THURSDAY, APRIL 11, 2013, 8:30AM, SCR 2 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 10, 2013, 8:30AM, SCR 2 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - TUESDAY, APRIL 9, 2013, 8:30AM, SCR 2 |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Appropriations(S) |
2013-03-28 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2013-03-28 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 106 NOES: 52 |
2013-03-28 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2013-03-26 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 4 ADOPTED |
2013-03-26 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2013-03-26 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2013-03-26 | House | Laid Over (H) - HA 4 ADOPTED |
2013-03-26 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2013-03-26 | House | Laid Over (H) - HA 1, HA 2 ADOPTED |
2013-03-26 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2013-03-25 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2013-03-25 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass with Time Limit (H) - time limit of six (6) hours total debate on perfection. |
2013-03-14 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-03-13 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2013-03-13 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-13 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-03-11 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-03-07 | House | Public Hearing Continued (H) |
2013-02-15 | House | Referred: Budget(H) |
2013-02-15 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-02-14 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |