MO HB1015 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-27 - Referred: Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation(H)
Pending: House Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-27 - Referred: Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation(H)
Pending: House Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reduces the state sales tax by .1% if the total amount of net state revenue collected has increased in each of the three previous fiscal years by $75 million
Title
Reduces the state sales tax by .1% if the total amount of net state revenue collected has increased in each of the three previous fiscal years by $75 million
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-27 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation(H) |
2015-04-27 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-21 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-21 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-04-14 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-03-31 | House | Referred: Ways and Means(H) |
2015-02-23 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-02-19 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1015&year=2015&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills151/billpdf/intro/HB1015I.PDF |