MO HB1041 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to distributions of income or principal from one trust to another trust.
Title
Modifies provisions relating to distributions of income or principal from one trust to another trust.
Sponsors
Rep. David Evans [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2019-02-25 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-02-21 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1041&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/2107H.01I.pdf |