MO HB1231 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Commissioner of the Office of Administration or other state purchasing agent to give a preference for forest products and bricks produced in Missouri whenever bids are comparable
Title
Requires the Commissioner of the Office of Administration or other state purchasing agent to give a preference for forest products and bricks produced in Missouri whenever bids are comparable
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-10 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2012-07-10 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2012-05-30 | Delivered to Governor | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2012-05-15 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 31 NAYS: 00 | |
2012-05-15 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2012-05-15 | Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-05-10 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2012-05-03 | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS | |
2012-04-17 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-04-12 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - TUESDAY, APRIL 17, 12:00PM, SCR 1 | |
2012-04-05 | Second Read and Referred: Small Business, Insurance, and Industry (S) | |
2012-03-28 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-03-28 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 152 NOES: 0 | |
2012-03-19 | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) | |
2012-03-01 | Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent (H) | |
2012-03-01 | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2012-03-01 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-21 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-02-21 | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2012-02-21 | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2012-02-21 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-14 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-06 | Referred: Transportation Funding and Public Institutions (H) | |
2012-01-11 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |