MO HB1251 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-14 - Referred: Tax Reform (H)
Pending: House Tax Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-14 - Referred: Tax Reform (H)
Pending: House Tax Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the reporting of health insurance information on Missouri income tax returns and the providing of a notice to those taxpayers eligible for health insurance assistance for dependent children
Title
Requires the reporting of health insurance information on Missouri income tax returns and the providing of a notice to those taxpayers eligible for health insurance assistance for dependent children
Sponsors
Sen. David Sater [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-14 | Referred: Tax Reform (H) | |
2010-01-07 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-06 | Read First Time (H) | |
2009-12-01 | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1251&year=2010&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills101/biltxt/intro/HB1251I.htm |