MO HB1251 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-22 - Second read and referred: Senate Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-22 - Second read and referred: Senate Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Allows any county of the first classification to waive competitive bid requirements on purchases less than $6000
Title
Allows any county of the first classification to waive competitive bid requirements on purchases less than $6000
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Elmer [R] | Rep. Lynn Morris [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government(S) |
2014-04-16 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-04-16 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 134 NOES: 13 |
2014-04-16 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-04-14 | House | Perfected (H) |
2014-04-14 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2014-04-03 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-03 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-03 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-03-27 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-03-27 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-27 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-03-25 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-03-12 | House | Re-referred to Committee: General Laws(H) |
2014-01-16 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-08 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |