MO HB1252 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the law regarding low-dose mammography screening
Title
Changes the law regarding low-dose mammography screening
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House: HB 1252 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 145 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House: HB 1252 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 145 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2018-06-01 | Senate | Approved by Governor (G) |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 32 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Taken Up |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, April 25, 2018, 9:07am, Bingham Conference Room |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 18, 2018, 10:01am, SCR 1 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Insurance and Banking(S) |
2018-04-09 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 145 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-04-09 | House | Taken Up |
2018-04-04 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2018-04-04 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2018-04-04 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2018-02-21 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-21 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-21 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-07 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2018-02-07 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-06 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-30 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-24 | House | Referred: Insurance Policy(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |