MO HB1256 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Imposes restrictions on the use of firearm tracking technology
Title
Imposes restrictions on the use of firearm tracking technology
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-07 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-03-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-28 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2018-02-28 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-27 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-24 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1256&year=2018&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4041H.01I.pdf |