MO HB1291 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises the definition of counties exempt from certain requirements of the county special road and bridge tax
Title
Revises the definition of counties exempt from certain requirements of the county special road and bridge tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-26 - House - House: HB 1291 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 130 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House: HB 1291 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 121 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House: HB 1291 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 135 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House: HB 1291 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 121 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House: HB 1291 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 135 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-05 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2018-07-05 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2018-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2018-05-30 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2018-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2018-05-09 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2018-05-09 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 30 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-05-09 | House | Senate Adopts Conference Committee Report (S) - AYES: 29 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-05-09 | House | Senate Submits Conference Committee Report (S) |
2018-04-26 | House | House Message (H) |
2018-04-26 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 121 NOES: 17 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-04-26 | House | House Adopts Conference Committee Report (H) - AYES: 130 NOES: 12 PRESENT: 1 |
2018-04-26 | House | House Submits Conference Committee Report (H) |
2018-04-26 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-04-26 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-04-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-04-18 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2018-04-18 | House | House Distributes Conference Committee Report (H) |
2018-04-04 | House | House Message (H) |
2018-04-04 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES HENDERSON, TOALSON REISCH, WALKER(3), ADAMS, BURNETT |
2018-04-03 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2018-04-03 | House | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - ROMINE, ONDER, HEGEMAN, SIFTON, WALSH |
2018-03-29 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2018-03-29 | House | Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S) |
2018-03-28 | House | House Message (H) |
2018-03-28 | House | House Refuses to Adopt, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference - SS SCS as amended |
2018-03-28 | House | Taken Up |
2018-03-27 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-27 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-03-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-03-15 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS as amended |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SSA 1 for SA 2, SA 3 adopted AYES: 26 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Taken Up |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 2 adopted/SA 3, SCS as amended |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Taken Up |
2018-03-08 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, March 6, 2018, 10:00am, Senate Lounge |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Local Government and Elections(S) |
2018-02-19 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2018-02-19 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 135 NOES: 9 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-19 | House | Taken Up |
2018-02-14 | House | Perfected (H) |
2018-02-14 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2018-02-14 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2018-02-05 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-05 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-18 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2018-01-18 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-01-17 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-01-17 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-17 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Referred: Local Government(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |