MO HB1292 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-01 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-01 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows landowners or a landowner's agent to use night vision devices or thermal imaging devices when hunting feral hogs.
Title
Allows landowners or a landowner's agent to use night vision devices or thermal imaging devices when hunting feral hogs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-01 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2020-03-18 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar |
2020-03-12 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2020-03-05 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-03-05 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-03-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-25 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2020-02-25 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 1 |
2020-02-24 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-24 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-27 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Referred: Conservation and Natural Resources(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-02 | House | Prefiled (H) |