MO HB1296 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-27 - SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-27 - SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits two-way telecommunications devices and their component parts in correctional centers and jails.
Title
Prohibits two-way telecommunications devices and their component parts in correctional centers and jails.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-10 - House - House: HB 1296 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 126 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-27 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2020-04-27 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2020-04-24 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - 1:00 p.m., Monday, April 27, 2020, Senate Chamber |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Second read and referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S) |
2020-02-10 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2020-02-10 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 126 NOES: 32 PRESENT: 1 |
2020-02-10 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2020-02-10 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2020-02-04 | House | Perfected (H) |
2020-02-04 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2020-02-04 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2020-01-27 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-01-27 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-01-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-22 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2020-01-22 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-01-21 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-01-21 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-14 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Referred: Corrections and Public Institutions(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-02 | House | Prefiled (H) |